THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 6:32:49 AM
Robertson, Daniel Kenneth Fraser
CPSO#:
32477
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Jun 1981
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Feb 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
95 Bayly st west
Ste G-1
Ajax ON L1S 7K8
Phone: 905 427-3996
Fax: (905) 619-0438
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Daniel K. Robertson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 11 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DANIEL KENNETH FRASER ROBERTSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBERTSON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1980 to 15 Jun 1981
Other - Rotating Internship
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 1981 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 13 Oct 2004 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 13 Oct 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Feb 2007 |