THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 15:44:29 PM
Hurowitz, Eric Ephraim
CPSO#:
32470
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Jun 1980
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Jun 1981
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Italian
Education: University of Toronto, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
203-305 Milner Ave
Scarborough Health Network Birchmou
Scarborough ON M1B 3V4
Phone: 416-335-4669
Fax: 1-844-222-7173
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Eric E. Hurowitz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 12 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Past patients can contact Suite 406, 4040 Finch Avenue East, Scarborough ON. M1S 4V5. Telephone Number (416) 335-4669, Fax Number (416) 335-4672
Date Received: 07 May 2019
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:18 Jun 1985 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Gastroenterology |
Effective:18 Nov 1987 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ERIC EPHRAIM HUROWITZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUROWITZ is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1980 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1981 |