THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 5:35:10 AM
Taynen, Howard Douglas
CPSO#:
32458
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
31 Jul 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
24 Jun 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1973
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
87 Butlers Drive North
Ridgeway ON L0S 1N0
Phone: (289)876-8044
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:08 Jun 1981 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1973 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Jun 1974 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1977 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 1981 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 2008 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Discipline Committee |
Effective: 24 Jun 2008 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Suspension of registration removed |
Effective: 31 Jul 2008 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Discipline Committee |
Effective: 24 Jun 2008 |
|
Active |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 24 Jun 2008
Summary:
On June 24, 2008, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario found that Dr. Howard Douglas Taynen committed acts of professional misconduct in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession. The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:
1. Dr. Taynen appear before the panel to be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the register.
2. The Registrar suspend Dr. Taynen's certificate of registration for a period of one month, to commence on July 1, 2008.
3. The Registrar suspend Dr. Taynen's certificate of registration for an additional period of one month, to commence February 1, 2009, all of which will be suspended if Dr. Taynen attends the following courses and provides proof thereof to the College prior to January 12, 2009:
(a) The College course "Understanding Boundary Issues and Managing the Risks Inherent in the Doctor-Patient Relationship";
(b) A College-approved ethics course; and
(c) Part A of the course offered by the Centre for Addiction and Mental Health and run by members of the Borderline Personality Disorder Clinic entitled "Dialectical Behaviour Therapy".
4. The following terms, conditions and limitations be imposed on Dr. Taynen's certificate of registration:
(a) Dr. Taynen shall not accept for treatment patients who have been identified as or diagnosed with Borderline Personality Disorder. If Dr. Taynen learns after commencing treatment with a patient that he or she has Borderline Personality Disorder he shall immediately cease treatment of the patient and shall refer such patient to another psychiatrist; and
(b) Within 30 days of the date of this Order, Dr. Taynen will contact the College for the purpose of setting up a comprehensive practice assessment, which assessment he shall undergo at his own expense, and he will co-operate fully with the practice assessment and will abide by any recommendations flowing therefrom.
5. Dr. Taynen pay to the College costs in the amount of $3,650.00 within 60 days of the date of this Order.
6. The results of this proceeding to be included in the register.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jun 24, 2008