THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 0:37:52 AM
Langlois, Elizabeth Anne
CPSO#:
32451
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
14 Sep 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Mount Sinai Hospital, 600 University Avenue, Toronto, ON M5G 1X5
Date Received: 29 May 2017
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 1 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1980 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1981 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 06 Jan 1983 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 May 1998 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 14 Sep 2015 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 14 Sep 2015 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2017 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: September 14, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the voluntary cease-to-practise Undertaking given by Dr. Elizabeth Anne Langlois to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective September 14, 2015:
Dr. Langlois has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine due to retirement and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.