THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 5:51:22 AM
Rafferty, Eugene Francis
CPSO#:
32423
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
20 Jun 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Jun 1981
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland Sch, 1971
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Eugene Rafferty Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 21 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:08 Jun 1982 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jan 1975 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 29 Mar 1977 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jul 1977 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jun 1981 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 20 Jun 2022 |