THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 11:41:07 AM
Carette, Simon
CPSO#:
32421
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Aug 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Jul 1998
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 1975
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Carette Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 30 2023
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:10 Jun 1980 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Rheumatology |
Effective:03 Dec 1981 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 1 - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 4 - Rheumatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jun 1981 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 06 Jan 1983 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jul 1998 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Aug 2023 |