THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 20:12:04 PM
McMullen, William Randall
CPSO#:
32384
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
19 Jul 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
16 Jun 1976
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: W.R. McMullen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 28 2018
Medical Records Location
Date Received: 19 Jul 2018
Instructions/Address:Patients may submit their medical record request to: [email protected]. Any patients who would like to access their hospital records may contact the Trillium Health Centre in Mississauga, Ontario.
Date Received: 10 Jan 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Gastroenterology |
Effective:01 Dec 1981 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:10 Jun 1980 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1976 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 1981 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 19 Jul 2018 |