THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/09/24 20:53:06 PM
Cooligan, Terrance Gregory
CPSO#:
32375
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jun 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 May 1981
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 1975
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. T. Cooligan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 1 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:12 Nov 1979 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Respirology |
Effective:26 Nov 1980 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Critical Care Medicine |
Effective:23 Sep 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1975 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1978 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 May 1981 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2022 |