THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 19:04:21 PM
Jackson, Bernard Stanley
CPSO#:
32358
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of
25 Dec 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 May 1981
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
25-Dec-2022
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty, 1972
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Bernard Stanley Jackson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 16 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery |
Effective:28 Nov 1979 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 1975 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1976 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jul 1976 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 1977 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1978 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1979 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 May 1981 |
Expired: Member deceased. |
Expiry date: 25 Dec 2022 |