THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 17:03:47 PM
Dillon, David Andrew
CPSO#:
32354
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
11 Sep 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: The Medical College of Wisconsin, 1973
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
Comprehensive Healthcare Network, Cliffwood Plaza
3891 Don Mills Road
Don Mills ON M2H 2S7
Phone: 647-532-7572
Date Received: 27 Apr 2016
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1983 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 31 Dec 1983
Resident 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1984 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate |
Effective: 24 May 1981 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 03 Jun 1982 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jan 1983 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 30 Aug 1983 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Dec 1986 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 17 Apr 1996 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 17 Apr 1996 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Fitness to Practise Committee |
Effective: 17 Apr 1996 |
Suspension of registration removed |
Effective: 17 Apr 1997 |
Terms and conditions amended by Fitness to Practise Committee |
Effective: 11 Dec 1998 |
Terms and conditions amended by Fitness to Practise Committee |
Effective: 19 Mar 2003 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Sep 2009 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2016 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: July 11, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. David Andrew Dillon to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective July 11, 2016:
Dr. Dillon was the subject of a College investigation into whether he engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in his general medicine practice and whether he engaged in professional misconduct in his use of a physician assistant in a walk-in environment. In the face of these allegations, Dr. Dillon resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
See PDF for full undertaking: