THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 11:06:12 AM
Cole, Edward Herman
CPSO#:
32347
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 May 1981
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 May 1981
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 1975
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
R Fraser Elliott Building
1st Floor, South Room 409
190 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4669
Fax: (416) 340-4016
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Nephrology |
Effective:15 Sep 1983 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:12 Nov 1979 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. EDWARD HERMAN COLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COLE is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1975 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1979 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 May 1981 |