THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 21:00:11 PM
Shkrum, Michael James
CPSO#:
32342
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Aug 1985
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Aug 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
339 windermere rd
London ON N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 36357
Fax: (519) 663-2930
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:30 Nov 1983 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MICHAEL JAMES SHKRUM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHKRUM is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1978 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 May 1981 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 20 Aug 1984 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 1985 |