THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 21:20:09 PM
Stein, Adam Max
CPSO#:
32341
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
21 Apr 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
10 Dec 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty, 1975
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Adam Stein Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 24 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:09 Jun 1981 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1977 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 May 1981 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 10 Dec 2019 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 10 Dec 2019 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 21 Apr 2020 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: April 21, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Adam Max Stein to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 21, 2020:
A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Stein engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in his psychiatry practice. In the face of these allegations, Dr. Stein resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)