THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 23:41:22 PM
Davidson, John Ross
CPSO#:
32326
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
02 Mar 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 May 1981
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: John Ross Davidson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 2 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street,
Toronto ON
M2K 1E1
Date Received: 02 Mar 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:17 Nov 1981 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1977 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 May 1981 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 Mar 2021 |