THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 6:14:43 AM
Le Blanc, Patricia Francesca
CPSO#:
32257
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
31 Aug 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 Aug 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Names:
Mason, Patricia Francesca (used until: 12 Jul 2009 )
Le Blanc, Patricia Francesca (used until: 21 Apr 2004 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
MCI The Doctor's Office
Various Locations
Head office
1 Yorkdale Road, Suite 209. Toronto
Toronto ON M6A 3A1
Phone: 416 440-4040
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PATRICIA FRANCESCA LE BLANC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LE BLANC is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 1979 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Mar 1981 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 14 Aug 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Aug 2009 |