THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 22:21:50 PM
Rikhye, Rakesh Kumar
CPSO#:
31816
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Apr 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Jul 1980
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi
Education: University of Toronto, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1-306 Rexdale Blvd
Woodbine Family Health Team
Etobicoke ON M9W 1R6
Phone: 4163425140
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Texas
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:03 Oct 2014 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RAKESH KUMAR RIKHYE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIKHYE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1979 to 14 Jun 1980
Other - Rotating Internship
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jul 1980 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 10 Apr 1981 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Apr 2009 |