THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 15:39:29 PM
Di Pierdomenico, Fernando
CPSO#:
31634
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of
27 Dec 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
05 Mar 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
27-Dec-2018
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Italian
Education: University of Toronto, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: F. Di Pierdomenico Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 29 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jun 1979 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 1980 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 10 Feb 2016 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 10 Feb 2016 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Mar 2018 |
Expired: Member deceased. |
Expiry date: 27 Dec 2018 |