THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 3:52:52 AM
Talwalkar, Prafullchandra Aravind
CPSO#:
31598
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of
08 Nov 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Jun 1980
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
8-Nov-2020
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Marathi
Education: University of Bombay, 1965
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: P.A. Talwalkar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 3 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 1979 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jun 1980 |
Expired: Member deceased. |
Expiry date: 08 Nov 2020 |