THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 22:34:32 PM
Hutchinson, Neil Thomas
CPSO#:
31576
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
13 Nov 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Neil T. Hutchinson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 16 2017
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Plastic Surgery |
Effective:23 Nov 1987 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 18 Jun 1979 to 16 Jun 1980
Other - Rotating Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1983 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1988 to 31 Dec 1988
CF - Plastic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 1979 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jun 1980 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 27 Jul 1983 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Nov 1987 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2017 |