THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 14:12:51 PM
Hirsz, Abraham Isaac
CPSO#:
31461
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 May 1980
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 May 1980
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Yiddish
Education: University of Manitoba, 1974
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 522
Box 58/59
790 Bay Street
Toronto ON M5G 1N8
Phone: (416) 591-1222
Fax: (416) 591-1227
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Hirsz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 30 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1983 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ABRAHAM ISAAC HIRSZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HIRSZ is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1974 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 16 Jun 1975 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 May 1980 |