THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 3:32:09 AM
Dorian, Paul
CPSO#:
31433
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Sep 1984
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Sep 1984
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Hungarian
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Room 6 - 027
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5152
Fax: (416) 864-5348
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:09 Jun 1983 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:03 Dec 1984 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PAUL DORIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DORIAN is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 1976 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Jun 1977 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1978 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Apr 1980 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1983 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Sep 1984 |