THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 21:17:10 PM
Lee, King Tak
CPSO#:
31405
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of
14 Sep 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Apr 1980
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
14-Sep-2020
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Chinese, English
Education: University of Toronto, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: K.T. Lee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 26 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jul 1978 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Apr 1980 |
Expired: Member deceased. |
Expiry date: 14 Sep 2020 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 12 Feb 1990
Summary:
In the course of a Hearing which began in November 1989, Dr. Lee pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 60(3)(a) of the Health Disciplines Act, 1980, as amended, in that he had been found guilty of an offence relevant to his suitability to practice. The Discipline Committee accepted this plea, and in February 1990 found Dr. Lee guilty of professional misconduct. Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Lee be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register, and that his licence to practice be suspended for a period of one month.
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 24 Nov 1989