THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 11:12:10 AM
Trepanier, Jean Roland
CPSO#:
31370
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
15 Jan 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
21 Mar 1984
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1977 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Mar 1980 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 21 Mar 1984 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 21 Mar 1984 |
Terms and conditions amended by Fitness to Practise Committee |
Effective: 15 Feb 1991 |
Terms and conditions amended by Fitness to Practise Committee |
Effective: 14 Mar 2001 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 15 Jan 2020 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Fitness to Practice
Decision Date: 15 Feb 1991
Summary:
On Feb 15, 1991, the Fitness to Practice Committee found Dr. Trépanier to be an incapacitated member of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario pursuant to clause 62(1)(b) of the Health Disciplines Act.
And, ordered the following terms and conditions imposed on Dr. Trepanier(s licence:
1. that he be monitored by a colleague, who is acceptable to the Registrar, who shall file yearly reports to the College;
2. that he undergo treatment with a physician who is familiar with the treatment of substance abuse, and is acceptable to the Registrar, who will monitor and file quarterly reports to the College;
3. that he continue to attend the Health Professionals Group as long and as frequently as recommended by his treating physician;
4. that he abstain from consuming narcotic or controlled drugs and the preparation of narcotics or controlled drugs, except as prescribed by his physician;
5. that he not prescribe narcotics or controlled drugs, nor the preparations of narcotics and controlled drugs.
On March 14, 2001, the Fitness to Practice Committee accepted Dr. Trepanier(s application to vary the terms and conditions as set out above.
The Committee directed:
1. that the Order of February 15, 1991, be rescinded and the following term and condition be imposed on Dr. Trepanier(s certificate of registration:
2. that Dr. Trepanier not prescribe narcotics or controlled drugs nor preparations of narcotics and controlled drugs except for Tylenol 2 and Tylenol 3;
3. either party may move before the Committee to vary or terminate the terms of this Order.
Appeal: No Appeal