THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 7:35:45 AM
Abdollah, Hoshiar
CPSO#:
31367
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 Mar 1980
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Mar 1980
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Baghdad College of Medicin, 1972
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 3380
Fax: (613) 548-1387
Electoral District: 06
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Belgium
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Providence Care Centre |
Kingston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Cardiology |
Effective:07 Dec 1982 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HOSHIAR ABDOLLAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDOLLAH is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Oct 1976 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1977 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jul 1979 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Mar 1980 |