THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 11:44:31 AM
Adey, Christopher Karl
CPSO#:
30842
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of
10 Mar 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
27 Jun 1979
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
10-Mar-2018
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. C. K. Adey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 5 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:27 Nov 1985 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 1979 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 19 Sep 1980 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 May 1981 |
Expired: Member deceased. |
Expiry date: 10 Mar 2018 |