THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 22:08:14 PM
Pirani, Mohamedraza Jafferali Kara
CPSO#:
30688
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 May 1989
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 May 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English, Gujarati, Kachchi, Swahili, Urdu
Education: Queen's University Belfast School of Med, 1975
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Joseph Brant Memorial Hospital
Department of Radiology &
Diagnostic Imaging
1230 North Shore Boulevard
Burlington ON L7R 4C4
Phone: (905) 632-3737 Ext. 1412
Fax: (905) 336-4148
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Joseph Brant Hospital |
Burlington |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:24 Nov 1981 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MOHAMEDRAZA JAFFERALI KARA PIRANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PIRANI is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jul 1976 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 May 1979 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 12 Oct 1988 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 May 1989 |