THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 19:24:00 PM
Jenkin, Peter John
CPSO#:
30653
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
17 Jul 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
31 Jan 2002
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1975
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Dermatology |
Effective:25 Nov 1980 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1975 to 30 Jun 1976
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1976 to 30 Jun 1977
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1975 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1977 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Apr 1979 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 10 Jul 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Jan 2002 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 17 Jul 2007 |