THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 2:08:53 AM
Saunoris, Algimantas
CPSO#:
30573
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
15 Apr 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
15 Jun 1977
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
6-Jan-2019
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, German, Lithuanian, Polish, Russian
Education: Vilnius State University, 1955
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1977 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jan 1979 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 20 Sep 2010 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 20 Sep 2010 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 15 Apr 2011 |
Concerns
Source:
Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: April 15, 2011
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective April 15, 2011, Dr. Saunoris has resigned from the College and agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.