THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
13/05/24 1:55:14 AM
Pencharz, Paul Bernard Onslow
CPSO#:
30370
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jul 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Aug 1978
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Liverpool School of Medici, 1967
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
Hospital for Sick Kids
555 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Date Received: 31 May 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:06 Nov 1974 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1969 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1970 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Aug 1978 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2021 |