THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/03/24 4:29:24 AM
Khan, Swaleha
CPSO#:
30313
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
03 Oct 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
20 Mar 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Bengali, English, Hindi, Urdu
Education: Utkal University, 1970
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Swaleha Khan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 3 2022
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Phone: 1-888-781-9083
Fax: 1-866-297-9338
Email: [email protected]
Date Received: 16 Oct 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Aug 1978 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 20 Mar 2020 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Mar 2020 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 03 Oct 2022 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: March 20, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Swaleha Khan to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective March 20, 2020:
Following a public complaint, a College investigation was conducted into Dr. Khan’s care of a patient in her family practice. As a result of the investigation:
Dr. Khan will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for a minimum of 3 months.
Dr. Khan will engage in professional education, including in the assessment and diagnosis of breast cancer and medical record-keeping.
Dr. Khan’s practice will be assessed by an assessor selected by the College within 3 months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.