THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
13/05/24 3:32:51 AM
Hall-Findlay, Elizabeth Joy
CPSO#:
30269
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
03 Dec 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
02 Dec 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Hall, Elizabeth Joy (used until: 17 Nov 2003 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Plastic Surgery |
Effective:30 Nov 1982 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1977 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jul 1978 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 26 Jan 1981 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 May 1982 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 15 Aug 1983 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Dec 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 03 Dec 2003 |