THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 0:19:24 AM
Kadiri, Yahaya Zekeri
CPSO#:
30260
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
26 Apr 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
28 Nov 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ibadan College of Medicine, 1971
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:15 Nov 1977 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jul 1974 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1978 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jul 1978 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 14 Jul 2010 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Discipline Committee |
Effective: 14 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 28 Nov 2019 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 Nov 2019 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 26 Apr 2023 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 14 Jul 2010
Summary:
On July 14, 2010, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Kadiri had committed an act of professional misconduct under paragraph 1(1)33 of Ontario Regulation 856/93 made under the Medicine Act, 1991, in that he has engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. Dr. Kadiri engaged in a shouting match with a surgeon outside of the operating room, in front of other people, lasting for several minutes.
The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:
1. The Registrar impose the following term, condition and limitation on Dr. Kadiri's certificate of registration:
(i) Dr. Kadiri shall successfully complete, at his own expense, a College approved Communications Course and shall provide proof thereof to the College. This term, condition and limitation shall remain in place until Dr. Kadiri has provided satisfactory proof to the College of his successful completion of the approved Communications Course.
2. Dr. Kadiri appear before the panel to be reprimanded.
3. Dr. Kadiri pay to the College costs in the amount of $3650 within 6 months of the date of this Order.
4. The results of this proceeding to be included in the register.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): July 14, 2010
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: November 28, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Yahaya Zekeri Kadiri to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective November 28, 2019:
A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Kadiri engaged in professional misconduct and/or was incompetent in the practice of anesthesia. As a result of the investigation, Dr. Kadiri has restricted his practice to chronic pain management without intravenous sedation and will not engage in general anesthesia or administer or prescribe intravenous procedural sedation.
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: November 19, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:
Download Full Document (PDF)