THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 19:33:10 PM
Eisen, Hillel David
CPSO#:
30253
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of
17 Jan 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
26 Jun 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
17-Jan-2019
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1977 to 12 Jun 1978
Other - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
Resident 1 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 1977 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jul 1978 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 07 Jun 2003 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 07 Jun 2003 |
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee |
Effective: 13 Nov 2003 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Feb 2007 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2013 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Oct 2014 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 03 Nov 2015 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 03 Nov 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 20 Nov 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 20 Apr 2016 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jun 2017 |
Expired: Member deceased. |
Expiry date: 17 Jan 2019 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 13 Nov 2003
Summary:
On November 13, 2003, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Hillel David Eisen committed professional misconduct in that he engaged in acts relevant to the practice of medicine that having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.
The Committee ordered and directed that:
1. Dr. Eisen attend before it to be reprimanded.
2. The fact of the reprimand be recorded on the register.
3. The Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Eisen(s certificate of registration:
(1) Dr. Eisen undertake at his own expense an assessment by the Quality Assurance Committee (QAC) and abide by the QAC(s recommendations and comply with any terms, conditions and limitations, which the QAC may impose on his certificate of registration. The QAC will be provided with the decision and reasons for decision of the Discipline Committee.
(2) Dr. Eisen is to successfully complete the next available College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario(s (Physician-Patient Communication and Interviewing Skills( course at his own expense.
(3) Dr. Eisen is to successfully complete the next available College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario(s (Understanding Boundaries and Preventing Boundary Violations in the Doctor-Patient Relationship( course at his own expense.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Nov 11, 2003