THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 2:56:20 AM
Tang, Anthony Sze-Leung
CPSO#:
30099
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Oct 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Oct 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital
Room C6 116
339 Windermere Road
London ON N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3746
Fax: (519) 663-3782
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
St Mary's General Hospital |
Kitchener |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:19 Jun 1985 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:02 Dec 1986 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANTHONY SZE-LEUNG TANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TANG is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jun 1978 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 20 Jul 1982 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jul 1982 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1986 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Oct 1988 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 06 Aug 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Oct 2013 |
Concerns
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: July 22, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:
Download Full Document (PDF)