THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 12:43:26 PM
Bondar, Roberta Lynn
CPSO#:
30010
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Jun 1978
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:1820 Bayview Ave PO Box 50225 Toronto ON M4G 0B5
Date Received: 27 May 2022
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New Mexico
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:02 Dec 1981 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1977 to 12 Jun 1978
Other - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
Resident 1 - Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 1 - Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 1 - Neuropathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
CF - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
CF - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 1977 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jun 1978 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2022 |