THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 18:32:52 PM
Kerr, Ian Graham
CPSO#:
29931
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 May 1982
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 May 1982
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1975
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Medpoint Health Care Centre
Sifton Centre-West5
1295 Riverbend Road, Suite 200
London ON N6K 0G2
Phone: (519) 432-1919
Electoral District: 02
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:13 Nov 1979 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. IAN GRAHAM KERR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KERR is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1975 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jun 1978 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 14 Aug 1980 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 May 1982 |