THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 7:33:03 AM
Rankin, Wayne Malcolm
CPSO#:
29921
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jul 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
26 May 1978
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Saskatchewan College of Me, 1971
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Wayne M. Rankin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 6 2020
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:patients seeking access to a copy of their record can contact Dr. Sean Richard Daniel Peterson located at 481 London Rd, Sarnia, ON, N7T 4X3
Date Received: 09 Jul 2021
Instructions/Address:Patients seeking access to a copy of their record can contact Dr. Sean Richard Daniel Peterson (CPSO 86555) located at 481 London Rd, Sarnia, ON, N7T 4X3
Date Received: 08 Jul 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 May 1978 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2020 |