THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 0:26:55 AM
Jablanczy, Alexander Joseph Nicholas
CPSO#:
29330
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
05 Jul 1977
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
2-Nov-2017
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Hungarian
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:For record information for patients who do not register with My Doctor Now please contact:
Suite 105
955 Queen Street East
Sault Ste Marie, ON P6A 2C3
Date Received: 15 Jun 2016
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 1977 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2016 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: June 1, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Alexander Joseph Nicholas Jablanczy to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective June 1, 2016:
Dr. Jablanczy was the subject of College investigations into his conduct and communications and his record-keeping in his family medicine practice. During the investigation of these allegations, Dr. Jablanczy resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario.
See PDF for full Undertaking.
Download Full Document (PDF)