THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 14:09:05 PM
Freeman, Joel Bernard
CPSO#:
29288
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
29 Jun 1977
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1966
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:31 Oct 1972 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 1977 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2013 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 11 Feb 2008
Summary:
On February 11, 2008 the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Freeman committed an act of professional misconduct in that he engaged in conduct unbecoming for a physician.
The Discipline Committee ordered the following:
1. The Discipline Committee directs Dr. Freeman to appear before the Panel to be reprimanded.
2. The Discipline Committee orders Dr. Freeman to pay costs to the College in the amount of $2,500.00 within 60 days of the date of this Order.
3. The Discipline Committee directs the results of this proceeding to be included in the register.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Feb 11, 2008
Concerns
Source:
Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: June 1, 2013
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Undertaking by Dr. Joel Bernard Freeman to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the “College”).
I, Dr. Freeman:
• Hereby resign from the College effective June 1, 2013 (the “Effective Date”).
• Hereby undertake not to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction after the Effective Date.