THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 11:27:35 AM
Martin, Michael George
CPSO#:
29279
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Aug 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Jun 1977
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1975
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Michael Martin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 18 2022
Corporation Name: M. Martin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 23 2012
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:18 Nov 1981 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jun 1975 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jun 1977 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Aug 2023 |