THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 23:59:46 PM
Ismail, Abdel-Raouf
CPSO#:
28956
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Aug 1980
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Feb 1977
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English, French
Education: University of Toronto, 1975
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2200 Dundas St E
Mississauga ON L4X 2V3
Phone: 905-232-0720
Fax: 905-232-0790
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Plastic Surgery |
Effective:01 Aug 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ABDEL-RAOUF ISMAIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ISMAIL is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1976 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Feb 1977 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 1978 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Aug 1980 |