THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 9:33:00 AM
Braude, Paul Robert
CPSO#:
28820
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
19 Jul 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Oct 1976
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Cape Town Faculty of Healt, 1974
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Paul Braude Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 17 2016
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:2900 Steeles Ave E
Thornhill, ON L3T 4X1
Date Received: 25 Mar 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 May 1976 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Oct 1976 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 19 Jul 2021 |