THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 0:20:57 AM
Calvin, James Eldon
CPSO#:
28613
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Oct 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Oct 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1975
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
Room E6-117
London ON N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 663-3892
Fax: (519) 663-8619
Electoral District: 02
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Illinois
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Cardiology |
Effective:05 Dec 1983 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:10 Jun 1980 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JAMES ELDON CALVIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CALVIN is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1975 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Aug 1976 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 22 Jun 1995 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Oct 2013 |