THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 22:50:13 PM
Young, James Gordon
CPSO#:
28416
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
05 Jul 1976
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1975
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1975 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jun 1976 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 1976 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2009 |
Concerns
Source:
Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: January 19, 2010
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Undertaking by Dr. James Gordon Young, to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the “College”). (NOTE: This is a summary of the undertaking. For the complete terms, contact the College’s Registration Department):
I, Dr. James Gordon Young:
2). Acknowledge that I have no intention to apply again for registration in Ontario, and I undertake to advise the College should I intend to re-apply.
3).Acknowledge that, in exchange for this Undertaking, the College agrees not to proceed with an investigation by the College pursuant to Section 75 of the Health Professions Procedural Code.
4).agree that should I re-apply to resume the practice of medicine in Ontario, the College shall have the right to proceed with the Section 75 investigation in which investigators were appointed on or about May 8, 2009.
6). Acknowledge and agree that should a referral of specific allegations to the Discipline Committee be made in relation to the terms of this Undertaking, the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario will be entitled to introduce this Undertaking as evidence at a hearing before the Discipline Committee, whether in relation to preliminary motions (as referred to above) or otherwise within the hearing.
7). consent and understand that this undertaking shall be information on the College’s register that is available to the public.