THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 10:22:25 AM
Howarth, Paul Ashworth
CPSO#:
28366
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
10 Dec 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
30 Jun 1976
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1975
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:24 Garden Avenue
Ancaster, ON L9G 2J5
Date Received: 09 Dec 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Emergency Medicine |
Effective:16 Nov 1987 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jun 1975 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 1976 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 10 Dec 2015 |