THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 7:28:26 AM
Rubenstein, Warren Howard
CPSO#:
28322
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jun 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Jun 1976
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1975
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1 Bedford Rd
Apartment 1005
Toronto ON M5R 2B5
Phone: 416-805-9591
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Warren Rubenstein Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 24 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:All records available at Mount Sinai Academic Family Health Team
email; [email protected]
phone: 416-586:4800 ext 5160
Date Received: 17 Mar 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1977 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 1975 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jun 1976 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2022 |