THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 23:40:19 PM
Khan, Abdul Ghaffar
CPSO#:
28018
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
09 Aug 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Jan 1976
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Urdu
Education: University of Karachi, 1961
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:For patients that saw Dr. Khan up to 2015, please contact:
Records Management Ltd
Unit 13
1 High Meadow Place
Toronto, ON, M9L 0A3
Phone:1-800-775-0093
www.recordsregistry.ca
[email protected]
For patients that saw Dr. Khan from 2016-2022, please contact:
DocuDavit Solutions
40 Ashwarren Road
North York, ON, M3J 1Z5
Phone: 1-888-781-9083
www.docudavit.com
Date Received: 15 Feb 2023
Instructions/Address:Records Management Ltd
Unit 13
1 High Meadow Place
Toronto, ON M9L 0A3
Tel:1-800-775-0093
[email protected]
Date Received: 06 Aug 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:22 Nov 1971 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jan 1976 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 09 Aug 2022 |