THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 6:02:17 AM
Vinegar, David Alan
CPSO#:
27885
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
28 Jun 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
30 Jun 1978
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1971
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Written requests for medical records should be sent to:
Suite 435
5 - 190 Minets Point Road
Barrie, ON
L4N 8J8
Date Received: 11 Jan 2008
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Dec 1973 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1974 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Public Service Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Feb 1975 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 20 May 1975 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Sep 1975 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 18 Sep 1975 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 27 Jan 1976 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 1978 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Feb 1981 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 28 Jun 2010 |