THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 17:33:35 PM
Bismilla, Fasel Abdul Hay
CPSO#:
27839
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jul 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
25 Jun 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland Sch, 1972
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Fasel Bismilla Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 29 2022
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Groves Memorial Community Hospital
131 Frederick Campbell Street
Fergus, ON
N1M 0H3
Date Received: 26 Apr 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jan 1975 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Sep 1975 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 25 Jun 2015 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 Jun 2015 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2022 |