THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
13/05/24 5:13:05 AM
Dolan, Michael Clifford
CPSO#:
27582
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
19 Dec 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
17 Jul 1975
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1974
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Michael Dolan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 7 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Emergency Medicine |
Effective:20 Nov 1985 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 1998 to 31 Aug 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jul 1975 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 17 Nov 1982 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jul 1986 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 19 Dec 2019 |